WI AB377 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-03 - Published 12-4-2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 66.1105 (7) (ak) 2.; and to create 66.1105 (6) (a) 19., 66.1105 (6) (am) 2. n. and 66.1105 (7) (ak) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: extending the life and tax increment allocation and project cost expenditure periods for Tax Incremental District Number 1 in the village of Marathon City. (FE)
Title
Extending the life and tax increment allocation and project cost expenditure periods for Tax Incremental District Number 1 in the village of Marathon City. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-03 | House | Published 12-4-2021 |
2021-12-03 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 12-3-2021. 2021 Wisconsin Act 94 |
2021-12-02 | House | Presented to the Governor on 12-2-2021 |
2021-11-12 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-12-2021 |
2021-11-12 | House | LRB correction |
2021-11-08 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-8-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Withdrawn from joint committee on Finance and made Available for Scheduling by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Referred to joint committee on Finance by Committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 41 (1)(e), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-11-05 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2021-10-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-10-26 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-10-26 | House | Read a second time |
2021-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-26-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-10-21 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Ways and Means, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2021-10-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-10-12 | House | Representative Ramthun added as a coauthor |
2021-10-12 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-06-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-06-07 | House | Introduced |