WI AB374 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 90.20 (1) (a); to amend 20.370 (1) (mu), 20.370 (3) (mu), 90.21 (2) (b), 90.21 (3) (c), 90.21 (6), 90.21 (7), 95.55 (1) (c) (intro.), 169.38 (1) (intro.) and 169.38 (2) (d); and to create 90.20 (1) (ag), 90.20 (2) (f), 90.20 (5), (6), (7) and (8), 90.21 (6m), 90.22 and 95.55 (1) (c) 7. of the statutes; Relating to: fence requirements for deer farms, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Fence requirements for deer farms, granting rule-making authority, and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-07-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-06 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-06-06 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab374 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB374.pdf |