WI AB374 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-9)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 77.255 of the statutes; Relating to: real estate transfer fee returns for conveyances exempt from the fee. (FE)
Title
Real estate transfer fee returns for conveyances exempt from the fee. (FE)
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Ballweg [R] | Rep. John Macco [R] | Rep. Nick Milroy [D] | Rep. Evan Goyke [D] |
Rep. Adam Jarchow [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] | Rep. Ed Brooks [R] | Rep. Todd Novak [R] |
Rep. Lisa Subeck [D] | Sen. Dale Kooyenga [R] | Rep. Joel Kitchens [R] | Rep. Mark Born [R] |
Rep. Eric Genrich [D] | Rep. David Murphy [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Sen. Romaine Quinn [R] |
Rep. Scott Allen [R] | Rep. Debra Kolste [D] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] | Sen. Devin LeMahieu [R] |
Sen. David Hansen [D] | Sen. Jon Erpenbach [D] | Sen. Julie Lassa [D] | Sen. Luther Olsen [R] |
Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Robert Cowles [R] | Sen. Janis Ringhand [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-12-22 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-12-22 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-12-22 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-12-10 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-15 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-15 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Ballweg |
2015-10-08 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2015-10-08 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab374 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB374.pdf |