WI AB372 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 13.106 (2), 16.54 (8r) (b), 36.11 (22) (a) 1. (intro.), 36.11 (22) (a) 2., 36.11 (22) (b), 36.11 (22) (d), 36.11 (54), 36.25 (25) (c), 36.45, 36.59 (2) (b) to (h), 36.59 (7) and 36.65 (4); to renumber 36.11 (22) (a) 1. a.; to renumber and amend 16.54 (8r) (a), 36.11 (22) (a) 1. b., 36.11 (22) (a) 1. c., 36.11 (22) (a) 1. d. and 36.11 (22) (c); to consolidate, renumber and amend 36.59 (2) (intro.) and (a); to amend 1.11 (2) (intro.), 1.11 (2) (j), 13.58 (5) (b) 6., 16.505 (2p) (a), 16.528 (5), 16.891 (1) (a), 16.953, 20.907 (1m), 36.09 (1) (j), 36.11 (16), 36.11 (22) (a) (intro.) and 36.11 (55m) (e); and to create 16.35, 36.11 (22) (a) 2m., 36.11 (22) (c) 1., 36.11 (22) (e) and 283.33 (10) of the statutes; Relating to: various University of Wisconsin System reporting requirements, commencement of the UW System's fall semester for graduate health science classes, UW System sexual assault and harassment information and reports, and energy cost reduction plans for certain state agencies. (FE)
Title
Various University of Wisconsin System reporting requirements, commencement of the UW System's fall semester for graduate health science classes, UW System sexual assault and harassment information and reports, and energy cost reduction plans for certain state agencies. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. David Murphy [R] | Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R] | Sen. Mary Felzkowski [R] | Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R] |
Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R] | Sen. Howard Marklein [R] | Sen. Janet Bewley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-09-09 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2019-09-04 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-09-03 | House | Representative Tusler added as a coauthor |
2019-08-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2019-08-12 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab372 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB372.pdf |