WI AB369 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-17 - Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to: timeline for local redistricting in Wisconsin following the 2020 federal decennial census.
Title
Timeline for local redistricting in Wisconsin following the 2020 federal decennial census.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate: Read a third time and concurred in (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 59 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | House | Failed to pass notwithstanding the objections of the Governor pursuant to Joint Rule 82 |
2022-05-17 | House | Placed on calendar 5-17-2022 pursuant to Joint Rule 82 (2)(a) |
2021-11-15 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-07-09 | House | Report vetoed by the Governor on 7-9-2021 |
2021-07-08 | House | Presented to the Governor on 7-8-2021 |
2021-06-24 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-24-2021 |
2021-06-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in, Ayes 18, Noes 12 |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-23-2021 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 59, Noes 38 |
2021-06-16 | House | Rules suspended |
2021-06-16 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2021-06-16 | House | Read a second time |
2021-06-09 | House | Placed on calendar 6-16-2021 by Committee on Rules |
2021-06-09 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2021-06-09 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on State Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2021-06-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2021-06-01 | House | Introduced |