WI AB369 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 13.0963, 15.407 (19) and 440.023 of the statutes; Relating to: review of and reports concerning occupational licenses. (FE)
Title
Review of and reports concerning occupational licenses. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representative Hutton |
2017-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Hutton |
2017-09-28 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton |
2017-08-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-06-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-02 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2017-06-02 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab369 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB369.pdf |