WI AB369 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 43.19 (1) (b) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: membership of certain federated public library system boards.
Title
Membership of certain federated public library system boards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-10-21 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-21 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Urban and Local Affairs, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-10-20 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-15 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2015-10-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-01 | House | Senator Bewley added as a cosponsor |
2015-09-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Urban and Local Affairs |
2015-09-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab369 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB369.pdf |