WI AB365 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 23.33 (6) (ce) of the statutes; Relating to: whip lights on all-terrain and utility terrain vehicles.
Title
Whip lights on all-terrain and utility terrain vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 6, Noes 5 |
2022-02-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2021-11-17 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Committee on Transportation |
2021-11-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-08-31 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-06-24 | House | Representative Knodl added as a coauthor |
2021-05-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-05-27 | House | Introduced |