WI AB365 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 346.01 (2); and to create 346.575, 346.60 (6) and 349.107 of the statutes; Relating to: the use of automated speed enforcement systems and traffic control photographic systems in a first class city and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The use of automated speed enforcement systems and traffic control photographic systems in a first class city and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2020-01-31HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2020-01-31HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 8, Noes 1
2020-01-31HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Local Government, Ayes 9, Noes 0
2019-10-29HouseExecutive action taken
2019-10-23HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Crowley
2019-10-16HousePublic hearing held
2019-09-16HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-08-12HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-08-12HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback