WI AB365 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Action ordered immediately messaged
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 40.51 (8), 40.51 (8m), 66.0137 (4), 120.13 (2) (g) and 185.983 (1) (intro.); and to create 609.845 and 632.883 of the statutes; Relating to: prohibiting lifetime and annual limits under health insurance policies and plans. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting lifetime and annual limits under health insurance policies and plans. (FE)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate: Refused concurrence (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate: Refused to adopt Senate Substitute Amendment 2 (Y: 16 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate: Senate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Senate - Senate: Withdrawn from the committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism and taken up (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - Assembly: Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - Assembly: Refused to table Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 (Y: 33 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-21 - House - Assembly: Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Insurance, and take up Ayes 97, Noes 0 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateAction ordered immediately messaged
2018-12-04SenateRefused concurrence, Ayes 16, Noes 17
2018-12-04SenateRead a third time
2018-12-04SenateSenators Bewley, Carpenter, Erpenbach, Hansen, Johnson, Larson, Miller, Ringhand, Risser, Shilling, L. Taylor, Vinehout and Wirch withdrawn as cosponsors
2018-12-04SenateRules suspended
2018-12-04SenateOrdered to a third reading
2018-12-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 3 laid on table
2018-12-04SenateRefused to adopt Senate Substitute Amendment 2, Ayes 16, Noes 17
2018-12-04SenateSenate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 laid on table, Ayes 18, Noes 15
2018-12-04SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 adopted
2018-12-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author
2018-12-04SenateRead a second time
2018-12-04SenateWithdrawn from committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism and taken up, Ayes 18, Noes 15
2018-12-04SenateSenate Amendment 2 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators Erpenbach, Shilling, Schachtner, Wirch, Miller, L. Taylor, Johnson, Vinehout, Carpenter, Larson, Frostman, Ringhand, Risser, Hansen and Bewley
2018-12-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 3 offered by Senators Craig and Kapenga
2018-12-04SenateSenate Amendment 1 to Senate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators Feyen and Fitzgerald
2018-12-04SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Senators Feyen and Fitzgerald
2018-11-30SenateRevived by the committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 93 (1), Ayes 3, Noes 2
2018-03-28SenateFailed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2018-02-20SenateSenate Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Senator Erpenbach
2018-01-26SenateRereferred to committee on Insurance, Financial Services, Constitution and Federalism, by the Senate President, pursuant to Senate Rule 20(1)(c)
2018-01-24SenateRepresentatives Anderson, Barca, Berceau, Billings, Bowen, Brostoff, Considine, Crowley, Doyle, Fields, Genrich, Hebl, Hesselbein, Hintz, Kessler, Kolste, Meyers, Milroy, Ohnstad, Pope, Riemer, Sargent, Shankland, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Stuck, Subeck, C. Taylor, Vruwink, Wachs, Young and Zamarripa withdrawn as coauthors
2018-01-23SenateRepresentative Goyke withdrawn as a coauthor
2017-07-18SenateFiscal estimate received
2017-06-23SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Housing and Trade
2017-06-22SenateReceived from Assembly
2017-06-21HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2017-06-21HouseRead a third time and passed, Ayes 62, Noes 35
2017-06-21HouseRules suspended
2017-06-21HouseRefused to suspend rules, Ayes 63, Noes 34
2017-06-21HouseOrdered to a third reading
2017-06-21HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 63, Noes 34
2017-06-21HouseRefused to table Assembly Substitute Amendment 1, Ayes 33, Noes 64
2017-06-21HouseAssembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Petersen and Sanfelippo
2017-06-21HouseRead a second time
2017-06-21HouseRules suspended to withdraw from committee on Insurance, and take up Ayes 97, Noes 0
2017-06-15HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-06-13HouseFiscal estimate received
2017-06-02HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Insurance
2017-06-02HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback