WI AB365 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 5.056, 6.24 (3), 6.275 (1) (b), 6.28 (1), 6.30 (1), 6.32, 6.33 (1), 6.33 (2) (a), 6.34 (2), 6.35 (1) (intro.), 6.36 (2) (c), 6.40 (1) (a) 1., 6.40 (1) (c), 6.50 (10), 6.55 (2) (d), 6.86 (3) (c), 6.87 (4) (b) 1., 7.08 (1) (c), 85.61 (1) and 343.027; to repeal and recreate 343.027; and to create 6.30 (5), 6.34 (2m), 6.34 (4) and 6.35 (2) of the statutes; relating to: electronic voter registration, verification of certain registrations, and proof of residence for voting in an election and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Electronic voter registration, verification of certain registrations, and proof of residence for voting in an election and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-12-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-11-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-11-09 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Election and Campaign Reform |
2011-11-09 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab365 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB365.pdf |