WI AB36 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 978.06 (5) (a); and to create 978.001 (1k) of the statutes; Relating to: allowing district attorneys, deputy district attorneys, and assistant district attorneys to engage in the private practice of law for certain civil purposes.
Title
Allowing district attorneys, deputy district attorneys, and assistant district attorneys to engage in the private practice of law for certain civil purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-06-20 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-20 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Judiciary, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2017-06-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-04-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-01-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab36 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB36.pdf |