WI AB358 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 100.30 (6) (title); and to create 100.30 (6) (a) 10. and 100.30 (6) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: regulating the sale of items that are qualified medical expenses below cost. (FE)
Title
Regulating the sale of items that are qualified medical expenses below cost. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-03-10 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 8, Noes 5 |
2021-10-19 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-07-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-07-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2021-05-27 | House | Introduced |