WI AB358 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 346.505 (2) (a); and to create 346.505 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: parking spaces reserved for persons with physical disabilities.
Title
Parking spaces reserved for persons with physical disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-12-10 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-12-10 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 14, Noes 0 |
2015-12-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-28 | House | Representatives Macco, Meyers, Tranel and Weatherston added as coauthors |
2015-10-28 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-09-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-09-25 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab358 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB358.pdf |