WI AB357 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Published 3-4-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 45.44 (1) (a) 18., 601.43 (1) (a) and 601.43 (1) (d); and to create 601.31 (1) (z), 601.31 (1) (zb), 601.31 (1) (zc) and chapter 629 of the statutes; Relating to: regulation of public adjusters and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Regulation of public adjusters and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | Published 3-4-2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-3-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 129 |
2020-02-28 | House | Presented to the Governor on 2-28-2020 by directive of the Speaker |
2020-02-17 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-17-2020 |
2020-02-17 | House | LRB correction |
2020-02-11 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2020-02-11 | House | Senate Amendment 1 concurred in |
2020-02-06 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-22 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 1) |
2020-01-21 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Read a second time |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Feyen |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-11-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2019-11-12 | House | Read a second time |
2019-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-12-2019 by Committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-11-06 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2019-10-31 | House | Representative Thiesfeldt added as a coauthor |
2019-10-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-10-17 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-10-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen |
2019-10-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-08-20 | House | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor |
2019-08-12 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2019-08-12 | House | Introduced |