WI AB357 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 27-2)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 180.0701 (2), 180.0702 (3) and 180.0720 (2); to amend 180.0703 (2) (intro.), 180.0705 (1), 180.0705 (4) (a), 180.0706 (2) (intro.), 180.0720 (3) and 180.0720 (4); and to create 180.0701 (2) (b), 180.0702 (3) (b) and 180.0709 of the statutes; Relating to: shareholders' meetings of business corporations.
Title
Shareholders' meetings of business corporations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-10-24 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-24 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Financial Institutions, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2017-10-18 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-09-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2017-05-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab357 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB357.pdf |