WI AB357 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 943.34 (1) (intro.), 943.34 (1) (bm) and 948.62 (1) (bm) of the statutes; relating to: receiving a stolen firearm and providing a penalty.
Title
Receiving a stolen firearm and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-01-12 | Report passage recommended by committee on Criminal Justice, Ayes 9, Noes 0 | |
2009-12-10 | Executive action taken | |
2009-10-15 | Public hearing held | |
2009-10-14 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-08-17 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-08-05 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-08-05 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-07-28 | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice | |
2009-07-28 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab357 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB357.pdf |