WI AB352 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Failed on March 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-23 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 40.22 (2) (a), 40.22 (2) (am), 40.22 (2m) (intro.), 40.22 (2r), 40.22 (3) (b) 2., 40.23 (1) (a) 1., 40.26 (1) and 40.26 (2) (intro.); and to create 40.26 (1m) of the statutes; relating to: eligibility for participating employee status and the Wisconsin Retirement System and post-retirement employment of annuitants under the Wisconsin Retirement System. (FE)
Title
Eligibility for participating employee status and the Wisconsin Retirement System and post-retirement employment of annuitants under the Wisconsin Retirement System. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Ziegelbauer [I] | Sen. Steve Nass [R] | Rep. Kevin Petersen [R] | Rep. Michael Endsley [R] |
Rep. Michelle Litjens [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. Evan Wynn [R] | Sen. Frank Lasee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-23 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2011-11-17 | House | Public hearing held |
2011-11-16 | House | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Bewley |
2011-11-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2011-10-31 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance |
2011-10-31 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2011/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab352 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2011/REG/AB352.pdf |