WI AB351 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 165.87 of the statutes; Relating to: body cameras on law enforcement officers. (FE)
Title
Body cameras on law enforcement officers. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-09 - House - Assembly: Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report concurrence recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 33 |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Barca, Anderson, Berceau, Brostoff, Crowley, Hebl, Hesselbein, Kessler, Pope, Sargent, Sinicki, Spreitzer, Zamarripa and C. Taylor |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 33 |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative C. Taylor |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 60, Noes 33 |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative C. Taylor |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-09 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kremer |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-06 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-11-06 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2017-11-06 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 8, Noes 4 |
2017-10-31 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-10-27 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kremer |
2017-10-05 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-10-02 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kremer and Crowley |
2017-05-31 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-05-31 | House | Introduced |