WI AB350 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 71.54 (1) (g) (intro.), 71.54 (2) (b) 4. and 71.54 (2m); and to create 71.54 (1) (h) and 71.54 (2) (b) 5. of the statutes; Relating to: increasing the maximum income, maximum property taxes, and threshold income under the homestead tax credit and indexing the credit for inflation. (FE)
Title
Increasing the maximum income, maximum property taxes, and threshold income under the homestead tax credit and indexing the credit for inflation. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-02-07 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-06-14 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-30 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2017-05-30 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab350 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB350.pdf |