WI AB35 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 972.02 (2); and to amend 756.06 (2) (a) and 972.04 (1) of the statutes; Relating to: the number of jurors in criminal cases. (FE)
Title
The number of jurors in criminal cases. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-03-06 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-31 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-01-20 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2017-01-20 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab35 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB35.pdf |