WI AB35 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 118.134 of the statutes; relating to: the use of race-based names, nicknames, logos, and mascots by school boards, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Title
The use of race-based names, nicknames, logos, and mascots by school boards, requiring the exercise of rule-making authority, and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-03-08 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | |
2010-03-05 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-03-04 | Messaged pursuant to Assembly Rule 50 (1) | |
2010-02-25 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 51, Noes 42, Paired 4 | |
2010-02-23 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-02-23 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 53, Noes 42 | |
2010-02-23 | Reconsideration of the vote by which Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 was refused adoption, Ayes 48, Noes 47 | |
2010-02-23 | Motion to reconsider vote by which Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 was refused adoption offered by Representative Strachota | |
2010-02-23 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Assembly amendment 3 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Assembly amendment 3 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Staskunas, Hraychuck, Vruwink, Hilgenberg, Garthwaite and Clark | |
2010-02-23 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted, Ayes 51, Noes 44 | |
2010-02-23 | Refused to table Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1, Ayes 47, Noes 48 | |
2010-02-23 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Vruwink | |
2010-02-23 | Refused to adopt Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1, Ayes 47, Noes 48 | |
2010-02-23 | Refused to table Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1, Ayes 46, Noes 48 | |
2010-02-23 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Vruwink | |
2010-02-23 | Read a second time | |
2010-02-22 | Senator Carpenter withdrawn as a cosponsor | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on calendar 2-23-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2010-02-17 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 8, Noes 5 | |
2010-02-17 | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Education, Ayes 13, Noes 0 | |
2009-06-18 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Soletski | |
2009-03-24 | Executive action taken | |
2009-03-20 | Assembly amendment 1 offered by Representative Soletski | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing held | |
2009-02-13 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-12 | Read first time and referred to committee on Education | |
2009-02-12 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab35 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB35.pdf |