WI AB342 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 7.53 (4), 7.60 (6) and 7.70 (5) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: time for issuing a certificate of election.
Title
Time for issuing a certificate of election.
Sponsors
Rep. Gae Magnafici [R] | Rep. Robert Kulp [R] | Rep. Rick Gundrum [R] | Rep. Robert Brooks [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Sen. Dan Knodl [R] | Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-02-04 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Campaigns and Elections, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2020-01-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-09-10 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-07-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Campaigns and Elections |
2019-07-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab342 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB342.pdf |