WI AB342 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Published 4-17-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 943.20 (3) (c) and 943.23 (6) (b); and to create 943.20 (3) (cm) and 943.23 (2g) and (3g) of the statutes; Relating to: taking, driving, or operating a commercial vehicle without consent and providing criminal penalties.
Title
Taking, driving, or operating a commercial vehicle without consent and providing criminal penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | House | Published 4-17-2018 |
2018-04-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 4-16-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 287 |
2018-04-12 | House | Presented to the Governor on 4-12-2018 |
2018-02-02 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-2-2018 |
2018-01-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-11-14 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-11-09 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-09 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-09 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on calendar 11-9-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-10-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-10-16 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 10, Noes 1 |
2017-09-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-08-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced |