WI AB341 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-14)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-14)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 704.145 of the statutes; Relating to: grace period for late rent payments by tenants receiving military housing allowances. (FE)
Title
Grace period for late rent payments by tenants receiving military housing allowances. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-08-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-30 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2019-07-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2019-07-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab341 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB341.pdf |