WI AB341 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 71.935 (4); to amend 71.935 (1) (a); and to create 71.935 (4) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: setoffs against tax refunds for debts related to providing ambulance services. (FE)
Title
Setoffs against tax refunds for debts related to providing ambulance services. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Senator Grothman added as a cosponsor |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Workforce Development, Forestry, Mining, and Revenue |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2014-02-20 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-02-20 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2014-02-20 | House | Read a second time |
2014-02-18 | House | Placed on calendar 2-20-2014 by Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-02-07 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on State and Local Finance, Ayes 6, Noes 2 |
2014-02-07 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on State and Local Finance, Ayes 7, Noes 0 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2014-01-31 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kaufert |
2013-10-23 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-09-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State and Local Finance |
2013-08-23 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab341 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB341.pdf |