WI AB340 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 342.065 (1m) of the statutes; Relating to: evidence of ownership for purposes of obtaining certain motor vehicle certificates of title. (FE)
Title
Evidence of ownership for purposes of obtaining certain motor vehicle certificates of title. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2019-10-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-09-25 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Tusler and Riemer |
2019-09-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-07-30 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2019-07-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2019-07-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab340 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB340.pdf |