WI AB338 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 24.09 (2), 24.11 (1) (c), 24.59 (3), 24.605 and 24.61 (2) (cm); to renumber 24.09 (1) (b) and 24.09 (1) (c); to renumber and amend 24.09 (1) (a), 24.09 (1) (bm) and 24.09 (1) (d); to amend 20.285 (1) (rm) (title), 20.507 (1) (h), 20.866 (2) (ta), 23.0917 (3) (br) 2., 23.0917 (3) (bt) 2., 24.01 (1), 24.01 (4), 24.01 (5), 24.01 (7), 24.01 (9), 24.01 (10), 24.09 (title), 24.10 (1), 24.10 (2), 24.59 (1), 36.49 (title) and 36.49 (3); and to create 23.0917 (3) (br) 3., 23.0917 (3) (bt) 3., 23.0917 (3) (bu), 23.0917 (3) (dm) 9., 23.1989, 28.12, 36.49 (4) and 59.52 (6) (f) of the statutes; Relating to: sale of public lands owned by the Board of Commissioners of Public Lands to the state; county management of certain state lands; merit scholarships for certain University of Wisconsin System students; the obligation of moneys for land acquisition under the Warren Knowles-Gaylord Nelson Stewardship 2000 Program; and making an appropriation (at the request of the state treasurer). (FE)
Title
Sale of public lands owned by the Board of Commissioners of Public Lands to the state; county management of certain state lands; merit scholarships for certain University of Wisconsin System students; the obligation of moneys for land acquisition under the Warren Knowles-Gaylord Nelson Stewardship 2000 Program; and making an appropriation (at the request of the state treasurer). (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-08-03 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-13 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-24 | House | Withdrawn from committee on State Affairs and referred to committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) |
2017-05-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab338 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB338.pdf |