WI AB338 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 20.255 (2) (er) and 119.755 of the statutes; Relating to: creating a summer reading improvement program in the Milwaukee Public School District and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Creating a summer reading improvement program in the Milwaukee Public School District and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-11-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-11-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 1 |
2015-11-13 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2015-11-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-11-04 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Pope |
2015-11-04 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Sinicki and Sanfelippo |
2015-10-08 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-07 | House | Representative Sinicki withdrawn as a coauthor |
2015-09-17 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2015-09-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab338 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB338.pdf |