WI AB338 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 238.15 (1) (a) to (L), 238.15 (1) (m) 1. (intro.), a. and b. and 238.15 (1) (m) 2.; to renumber and amend 238.15 (1) (intro.), 238.15 (1) (m) 1. c., 238.15 (2) and 238.15 (3); to amend 71.07 (3q) (c), 71.07 (5b) (a) 2., 71.07 (5b) (b), 71.07 (5b) (d) 1., 71.07 (5b) (d) 3., 71.07 (5d) (a) 1. (intro.), 71.07 (5d) (a) 2m., 71.07 (5d) (a) 3., 71.07 (5d) (b) (intro.), 71.07 (5d) (b) 2., 71.07 (5d) (c) 2., 71.07 (5d) (d) 1., 71.07 (5d) (d) 2., 71.10 (4) (gwb), 71.10 (4) (gx), 71.10 (4) (i), 71.28 (3q) (c) 3., 71.28 (5b) (a) 2., 71.28 (5b) (b), 71.28 (5b) (d) 1., 71.28 (5b) (d) 3., 71.30 (3) (eop), 71.30 (3) (f), 71.47 (3q) (c) 3., 71.47 (5b) (a) 2., 71.47 (5b) (b), 71.47 (5b) (d) 1., 71.47 (5b) (d) 3., 71.49 (1) (eop), 71.49 (1) (f), 73.03 (63), 76.638 (1), 76.638 (2), 238.16 (4) (c) and 238.303 (1) (a); and to create 20.835 (2) (ba), 71.07 (5b) (d) 1m., 71.07 (5b) (d) 4., 71.07 (5d) (b) 3., 71.07 (5d) (d) 2m., 71.07 (5d) (d) 5., 71.28 (5b) (d) 1m., 71.28 (5b) (d) 4., 71.47 (5b) (d) 1m. and 71.47 (5b) (d) 4. of the statutes; Relating to: allowing refunds for the early stage seed and angel investment tax credits and having the Department of Administration administer the credits and making an appropriation. (FE)
Title
Allowing refunds for the early stage seed and angel investment tax credits and having the Department of Administration administer the credits and making an appropriation. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-10-08 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining and take up (Y: 38 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-10-08 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining and take up, Ayes 38, Noes 56 |
2013-09-30 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-09-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Mining |
2013-08-23 | House | Introduced |