WI AB336 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 29.193 (1m) (a) 3. of the statutes; Relating to: trolling permits issued to persons whose sight is impaired. (FE)
Title
Trolling permits issued to persons whose sight is impaired. (FE)
Sponsors
Rep. Jesse Kremer [R] | Rep. Cody Horlacher [R] | Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R] | Rep. David Steffen [R] |
Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R] | Sen. Duey Stroebel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2016-02-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on calendar 2-11-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2015-10-30 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-30 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-10-28 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-09-28 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-09-14 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2015-09-14 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab336 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB336.pdf |