WI AB336 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 20.285 (1) (gb), 20.285 (1) (gb), 39.435 (8) and 39.435 (8); and to create 20.235 (1) (kd) of the statutes; Relating to: funding for Wisconsin higher education grants for University of Wisconsin System students and making appropriations. (FE)
Title
Funding for Wisconsin higher education grants for University of Wisconsin System students and making appropriations. (FE)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up (Y: 38 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2014-02-18 | House | Representative Hulsey added as a coauthor |
2014-02-18 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from joint committee on Finance and take up, Ayes 38, Noes 59 |
2013-09-10 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2013-08-23 | House | Read first time and referred to Joint Committee on Finance |
2013-08-23 | House | Introduced |