WI AB335 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-12)
Status: Passed on November 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-03 - Published 11-4-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-12)
Status: Passed on November 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-03 - Published 11-4-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 961.14 (2) (a), (ae), (cd), (cg), (dg), (er), (eu), (ey), (ne), (qs), (rj), (tg) and (xm); to amend 961.01 (12g); and to create 961.14 (2) (nd) of the statutes; Relating to: fentanyl analogs and providing a criminal penalty.
Title
Fentanyl analogs and providing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-03 | House | Published 11-4-2017 |
2017-11-03 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-3-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 60 |
2017-11-03 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-3-2017 |
2017-11-03 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-3-2017 |
2017-11-02 | House | Action ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-02 | House | Senate Amendment 1 concurred in |
2017-10-31 | House | Received from Senate amended and concurred in as amended (Senate amendment 1 adopted) |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in as amended |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Senator Vinehout added as a cosponsor |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Report concurrence as amended recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-09-20 | Senate | Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-09-19 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2017-09-18 | Senate | Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Testin |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-21 | House | Representative Skowronski added as a coauthor |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-06-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 withdrawn and returned to author |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-20 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-14 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-06-13 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-06-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-06-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-07 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kleefisch |
2017-06-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced |