WI AB334 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on July 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Representative Vining added as a coauthor
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 941.29 (1g) (a) and 971.17 (1g); to amend 973.176 (1); and to create 941.29 (1g) (ah), 941.29 (1m) (ag), 941.29 (1m) (cm), 971.17 (1g) (b) and 973.136 of the statutes; Relating to: the possession of a firearm by a person who has committed a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence and providing a penalty. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The possession of a firearm by a person who has committed a misdemeanor crime of domestic violence and providing a penalty. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11HouseRepresentative Vining added as a coauthor
2019-09-09HouseRepresentative Zamarripa added as a coauthor
2019-08-28HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-08-16HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-07-10HouseRepresentative Emerson added as a coauthor
2019-07-03HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2019-07-03HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback