WI AB334 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 632.63 of the statutes; Relating to: life insurance and annuity benefits.
Title
Life insurance and annuity benefits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2018-01-05 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Insurance, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2017-12-05 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-12-05 | House | Representative Young added as a coauthor |
2017-11-16 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Insurance |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab334 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB334.pdf |