WI AB333 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-21 - Published 6-1-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 885.14 of the statutes; relating to: limiting disclosure of information gathered by news persons.
Title
Limiting disclosure of information gathered by news persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-21 | Published 6-1-2010 | |
2010-05-19 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-18-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 400 | |
2010-05-13 | Presented to the Governor on 5-13-2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-20 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-19 | Senator Grothman added as a cosponsor | |
2010-04-16 | Placed on calendar 4-20-2010 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | |
2009-12-02 | Available for scheduling | |
2009-12-02 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 | |
2009-12-01 | Executive action taken | |
2009-10-29 | Public hearing held | |
2009-09-24 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary, Corrections, Insurance, Campaign Finance Reform, and Housing | |
2009-09-23 | Received from Assembly | |
2009-09-22 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2009-09-22 | Read a third time and passed | |
2009-09-22 | Rules suspended | |
2009-09-22 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 laid on table, Ayes 50, Noes 45 | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 2 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Gundrum, Vos and Zipperer | |
2009-09-22 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 adopted | |
2009-09-22 | Read a second time | |
2009-09-17 | Placed on calendar 9-22-2009 by committee on Rules | |
2009-09-17 | Assembly amendment 1 to Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representatives Kessler and Parisi | |
2009-09-16 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-09-16 | Report passage as amended recommended by committee on Judiciary and Ethics, Ayes 8, Noes 2 | |
2009-09-16 | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by committee on Judiciary and Ethics, Ayes 8, Noes 2 | |
2009-09-09 | Executive action taken | |
2009-09-08 | Assembly substitute amendment 1 offered by Representative Parisi | |
2009-07-14 | Public hearing held | |
2009-06-30 | Read first time and referred to committee on Judiciary and Ethics | |
2009-06-30 | Introduced |