WI AB331 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 973.015 (1m) (a) 1.; to amend 950.04 (1v) (g) and 973.015 (1m) (b); and to create 111.335 (1) (am), 165.83 (2) (q), 973.015 (1m) (a) 1. a. and b., 973.015 (1m) (a) 3. c. and d. and 4., 973.015 (1m) (c), 973.015 (4) and 973.181 of the statutes; Relating to: expungement of records of certain crimes. (FE)
Title
Expungement of records of certain crimes. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-07 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2017-10-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 offered by Representatives Steffen and Goyke |
2017-09-22 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-09-13 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 offered by Representatives Steffen and Goyke |
2017-08-28 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-08-28 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 2 |
2017-08-28 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0 |
2017-07-26 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Steffen and Goyke |
2017-06-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-06-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-08 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-06-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Steffen and Goyke |
2017-06-06 | House | Senator Hansen added as a cosponsor |
2017-06-01 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-31 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2017-05-25 | House | Representatives Tranel and Ballweg added as coauthors |
2017-05-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-19 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
2017-05-19 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab331 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB331.pdf |