WI AB33 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Available for scheduling
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to renumber 111.335 (3) (a); to renumber and amend 973.015 (1m) (a) 1.; to amend 111.335 (4) (b), 111.335 (4) (c) 1. (intro.), 111.335 (4) (e), 111.335 (4) (f) 1., 950.04 (1v) (g) and 973.015 (1m) (b); and to create 111.335 (3) (ag), 973.015 (1m) (a) 1. a. and b., 973.015 (1m) (a) 3. c. and d. and 4., 973.015 (1m) (c) and 973.015 (4) of the statutes; Relating to: expungement of records of certain crimes. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expungement of records of certain crimes. (FE)

Sponsors

Rep. David Steffen [R]Rep. Evan Goyke [D]Rep. Scott Allen [R]Rep. Jimmy Anderson [D]
Rep. Jill Billings [D]Rep. Mark Born [R]Rep. David Bowen [D]Rep. Ed Brooks [R]
Rep. Jonathan Brostoff [D]Rep. Marisabel Cabrera [D]Rep. Dave Considine [D]Rep. David Crowley [D]
Rep. Steve Doyle [D]Rep. James Edming [R]Rep. Mary Felzkowski [R]Rep. Jason Fields [D]
Rep. Rick Gundrum [R]Rep. Kalan Haywood [D]Rep. Gordon Hintz [D]Rep. Samantha Kerkman [R]
Rep. Debra Kolste [D]Rep. Scott Krug [R]Rep. Robert Kulp [R]Rep. Amy Loudenbeck [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Mursau [R]Rep. LaKeshia Myers [D]Rep. Todd Novak [R]Rep. John Nygren [R]
Rep. Tod Ohnstad [D]Rep. Warren Petryk [R]Rep. Jon Plumer [R]Rep. Sondy Pope [D]
Rep. Treig Pronschinske [R]Rep. Romaine Quinn [R]Rep. Timothy Ramthun [R]Rep. Daniel Riemer [D]
Rep. Michael Rohrkaste [R]Rep. Melissa Sargent [D]Rep. Michael Schraa [R]Rep. Christine Sinicki [D]
Rep. Kenneth Skowronski [R]Rep. Patrick Snyder [R]Rep. Shae Sortwell [R]Rep. John Spiros [R]
Rep. Mark Spreitzer [D]Rep. Shelia Stubbs [D]Rep. Lisa Subeck [D]Rep. Gary Tauchen [R]
Rep. Chris Taylor [D]Rep. Jeremy Thiesfeldt [R]Rep. Paul Tittl [R]Rep. Robyn Vining [D]
Rep. Don Vruwink [D]Rep. Jocasta Zamarripa [D]Rep. Shannon Zimmerman [R]Sen. Alberta Darling [R]
Sen. Fred Risser [D]Sen. Lena Taylor [D]Sen. Kathleen Bernier [R]Sen. Timothy Carpenter [D]
Sen. Dan Feyen [R]Sen. LaTonya Johnson [D]Sen. Christopher Larson [D]Sen. Luther Olsen [R]
Sen. Jerry Petrowski [R]Sen. Janis Ringhand [D]Sen. Patty Schachtner [D]Sen. Jeff Smith [D]
Sen. Patrick Testin [R]Sen. Thomas Tiffany [R]Sen. Van Wanggaard [R]Sen. Robert Wirch [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16SenateAvailable for scheduling
2019-05-16SenateRead first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization
2019-05-16SenateReceived from Assembly
2019-05-15HouseOrdered immediately messaged
2019-05-15HouseRepresentatives Hesselbein and Shankland added as coauthors
2019-05-15HouseRead a third time and passed
2019-05-15HouseRules suspended
2019-05-15HouseOrdered to a third reading
2019-05-15HouseAssembly Amendment 2 adopted
2019-05-15HouseAssembly Amendment 1 adopted
2019-05-15HouseWithdrawn from joint committee on Finance and taken up
2019-05-15HouseReferred to joint committee on Finance
2019-05-15HouseRead a second time
2019-05-09HouseAssembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Steffen
2019-05-09HousePlaced on calendar 5-15-2019 by Committee on Rules
2019-04-29HouseReferred to committee on Rules
2019-04-29HouseReport passage as amended recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 10, Noes 1
2019-04-29HouseReport Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety, Ayes 12, Noes 0
2019-04-29HouseLRB correction
2019-03-28HouseExecutive action taken
2019-03-26HouseAssembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen
2019-03-18HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-07HousePublic hearing held
2019-03-07HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-06HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-03-05HouseRepresentatives Neubauer and Emerson added as coauthors
2019-02-27HouseRepresentative Gruszynski added as a coauthor
2019-02-25HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-02-22HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback