WI AB33 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Published 7-2-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 452.137 (4) (a) of the statutes; Relating to: cooperative agreements for out-of-state real estate brokers, salespersons, and time-share salespersons. (FE)
Title
Cooperative agreements for out-of-state real estate brokers, salespersons, and time-share salespersons. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Published 7-2-2015 |
2015-07-01 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 7-1-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 47 |
2015-06-30 | House | Presented to the Governor on 6-30-2015 |
2015-06-15 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 6-15-2015 |
2015-06-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Placed on calendar 6-9-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade and rereferred to committee on Senate Organization pursuant to Senate Rule 46(2)(c) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Insurance, Housing, and Trade |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-05-13 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-05-13 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-05-13 | House | Read a second time |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on calendar 5-13-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-05-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Housing and Real Estate, Ayes 8, Noes 0 |
2015-04-30 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-04-02 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-02-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Housing and Real Estate |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced |