WI AB328 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-9)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 29.014 (1s) of the statutes; Relating to: a uniform end date for certain open hunting and trapping seasons. (FE)
Title
A uniform end date for certain open hunting and trapping seasons. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-11-02 | House | Representative Barca added as a coauthor |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-06-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 12, Noes 1 |
2017-06-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-06-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-06-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Milroy |
2017-06-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2017-05-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-23 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Milroy |
2017-05-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2017/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab328 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2017/REG/AB328.pdf |