WI AB326 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Published 3-29-2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 103.66 (1); and to create 103.66 (1) (b) of the statutes; Relating to: employment of minors as lifeguards.
Title
Employment of minors as lifeguards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-07 - House - Assembly: Read a third time and passed (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Published 3-29-2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-28-2018. 2017 Wisconsin Act 153 |
2018-03-27 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-27-2018 |
2018-02-02 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 2-2-2018 |
2018-01-23 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read a second time |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-23-2018 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-11-07 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-11-07 | House | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 78, Noes 14 |
2017-11-07 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-11-07 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-11-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-11-07 | House | Read a second time |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed on calendar 11-7-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-11-01 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-11-01 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 10, Noes 3 |
2017-11-01 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Workforce Development, Ayes 13, Noes 0 |
2017-09-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-08-16 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Kooyenga |
2017-06-20 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Workforce Development |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced |