WI AB326 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-1)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to create 86.35 of the statutes; Relating to: requiring approval by a municipal governing body before construction of highway roundabouts. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring approval by a municipal governing body before construction of highway roundabouts. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-13HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2015-10-28HousePublic hearing held
2015-09-09HouseRepresentative R. Brooks added as a coauthor
2015-09-03HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Transportation
2015-09-03HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback