WI AB326 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-5)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 943.21 (1c); to amend 943.21 (title), 943.21 (3) (am) (intro.) and 943.212 (title); and to create 943.21 (1c) (b), 943.21 (1m) (e) and 943.21 (2t) of the statutes; relating to: committing fraud on certain service providers and providing a penalty.
Title
Committing fraud on certain service providers and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing held | |
2009-07-30 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-07-08 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-07-07 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-06-19 | Read first time and referred to committee on Criminal Justice | |
2009-06-19 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab326 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB326.pdf |