WI AB323 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 299.48 of the statutes; Relating to: regulating fire fighting foam that contains certain contaminants and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Regulating fire fighting foam that contains certain contaminants and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-22 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2) |
2020-01-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representatives C. Taylor, Hebl, Sargent, Shankland, Billings, Kolste, Considine, Subeck, Vining, Emerson, Brostoff, Cabrera, Vruwink, Stuck, Bowen, Riemer, Goyke, Crowley and Neubauer |
2020-01-16 | House | Placed on calendar 1-21-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2020-01-16 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 8, Noes 1 |
2020-01-16 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2020-01-16 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Environment, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2019-12-11 | House | Executive action taken |
2019-12-10 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren |
2019-11-18 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren |
2019-09-26 | House | Representative Steffen added as a coauthor |
2019-09-03 | House | Public hearing held |
2019-08-30 | House | Representative Kitchens added as a coauthor |
2019-07-25 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2019-06-27 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Environment |
2019-06-27 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2019/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab323 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2019/REG/AB323.pdf |