WI AB323 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-13 - Published 11-12-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on November 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-13 - Published 11-12-2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 29.001 (30) and 29.001 (36); and to create 29.192 (6) of the statutes; Relating to: requiring an open season for woodchucks.
Title
Requiring an open season for woodchucks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-13 | House | Published 11-12-2017 |
2017-11-13 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2017. 2017 Wisconsin Act 64 |
2017-11-09 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-9-2017 |
2017-11-06 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-6-2017 |
2017-10-31 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-10-31 | Senate | Read a second time |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Placed on calendar 10-31-2017 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2017-10-27 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2017-06-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-21 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2017-06-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 adopted |
2017-06-21 | House | Read a second time |
2017-06-14 | House | Placed on calendar 6-21-2017 by Committee on Rules |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2017-06-13 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 9, Noes 4 |
2017-06-13 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage, Ayes 11, Noes 2 |
2017-06-07 | House | Executive action taken |
2017-05-30 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Jacque |
2017-05-24 | House | Public hearing held |
2017-05-16 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Sporting Heritage |
2017-05-16 | House | Introduced |