WI AB322 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on November 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-11-11 - Published 11-12-2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 340.01 (6u) and 349.13 (1h) of the statutes; Relating to: highway parking of motor vehicles owned by carsharing organizations.
Title
Highway parking of motor vehicles owned by carsharing organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-11 | House | Published 11-12-2015 |
2015-11-11 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 11-11-2015. 2015 Wisconsin Act 73 |
2015-11-10 | House | Presented to the Governor on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-10 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 11-10-2015 |
2015-11-09 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-11-06 | Senate | Read a second time |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-6-2015 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2015-11-05 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2015-10-29 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2015-10-28 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2015-10-27 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2015-10-27 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2015-10-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-10-27 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2015-10-27 | House | Read a second time |
2015-10-27 | House | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up |
2015-10-21 | House | Placed on calendar 10-27-2015 by Committee on Rules |
2015-09-25 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-09-25 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Transportation, Ayes 15, Noes 0 |
2015-09-24 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-09-24 | House | Representative Bowen added as a coauthor |
2015-09-15 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-09-01 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-09-01 | House | Introduced |