WI AB321 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to amend 292.31 (1) (d) (intro.); and to create 20.370 (4) (aa), 20.370 (4) (ab), 20.370 (4) (ad), 20.370 (4) (ae), 20.370 (4) (ak), 160.07 (4) (f), 160.07 (7), 160.15 (4), 281.17 (8) (c), 285.27 (2) (bm), 292.31 (1) (d) 1m., 292.74 and 299.15 (2m) of the statutes; Relating to: setting standards for certain contaminants, providing information relating to off-site disposal of certain waste, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Setting standards for certain contaminants, providing information relating to off-site disposal of certain waste, extending the time limit for emergency rule procedures, providing an exemption from emergency rule procedures, granting rule-making authority, and making an appropriation. (FE)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-01HouseFailed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
2019-12-05HouseRepresentative Doyle added as a coauthor
2019-08-09HouseFiscal estimate received
2019-06-27HouseRead first time and referred to Committee on Environment
2019-06-27HouseIntroduced

Wisconsin State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback