WI AB320 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 440.962 (1) (a), 440.962 (1) (b), 440.962 (1) (c), 440.962 (1) (d) and 440.964; to renumber 440.96 (2); to renumber and amend 440.96 (1); to amend 440.965; and to create 440.96 (1g), 440.96 (1r) (b) 2., 440.96 (3), 440.962 (1) (am), 440.968 (1) (e), 440.9693 and 440.9696 of the statutes; Relating to: registration and the scope of practice of interior designers and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Registration and the scope of practice of interior designers and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-02-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-02-22 | House | Made a special order of business at 8:08 AM on 2-23-2022 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 29 |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-02-17 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2022-02-17 | House | Report Assembly Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2022-02-15 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Horlacher |
2021-11-04 | House | Representative Penterman added as a coauthor |
2021-09-24 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Amendment 2) |
2021-06-22 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2021-06-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-06-21 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell |
2021-06-11 | House | Senator Roys withdrawn as a cosponsor |
2021-05-18 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-18 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2021-05-10 | House | Representative Hong withdrawn as a coauthor |
2021-05-10 | House | Representative Allen added as a coauthor |
2021-05-07 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Regulatory Licensing Reform |
2021-05-07 | House | Introduced |