WI AB32 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 41-0)
Status: Failed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal 19.36 (12), 66.0903 (1) (a), (am), (b), (cm), (dr), (em), (hm) and (im), 66.0903 (1m) (a) 1. to 3., 66.0903 (2) to (12), 84.41 (3), 103.49, 103.50, 104.001 (3) (a), 106.04, 111.322 (2m) (c), 227.01 (13) (t), 229.682 (2), 229.8275 and 946.15; to renumber and amend 66.0903 (1m) (a) (intro.); to consolidate, renumber and amend 104.001 (3) (intro.) and (b); to amend 19.36 (3), 59.20 (3) (a), 66.0129 (5), 66.0903 (1) (c), 66.0903 (1) (f), 66.0903 (1) (j), 66.0903 (1m) (b), 103.005 (12) (a), 103.503 (1) (a), 103.503 (1) (c), 103.503 (1) (e), 103.503 (1) (g), 103.503 (2), 103.503 (3) (a) 2., 109.09 (1), 111.322 (2m) (a), 111.322 (2m) (b), 111.322 (2m) (d), 230.13 (1) (intro.), 233.13 (intro.) and 978.05 (6) (a); and to repeal and recreate 66.0903 (title) and 66.0903 (1) (g) of the statutes; Relating to: elimination of the requirement that laborers, workers, mechanics, and truck drivers employed on the site of a project of public works be paid the prevailing wage. (FE)
Title
Elimination of the requirement that laborers, workers, mechanics, and truck drivers employed on the site of a project of public works be paid the prevailing wage. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2015-07-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-07-07 | House | Referred to calendar of 7-8-2015 pursuant to Assembly Rule 93 |
2015-07-07 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor, Ayes 5, Noes 4 |
2015-07-06 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Hutton |
2015-05-28 | House | Representative Bernier withdrawn as a coauthor |
2015-05-27 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-05-27 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-05-26 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2015-04-22 | House | Senator Stroebel added as a cosponsor |
2015-03-23 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-19 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-16 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-11 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-03-02 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-26 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-02-17 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor |
2015-02-17 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2015/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab32 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2015/REG/AB32.pdf |