WI AB32 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Published 5-26-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-17 - Published 5-26-2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber 343.245 (3m) (title) and 343.245 (3m) (a) and (b); to amend 85.103 (6); and to create 343.247 (1) of the statutes; relating to: extending the employer notification program administered by the Department of Transportation to noncommercial motor vehicle drivers.
Title
Extending the employer notification program administered by the Department of Transportation to noncommercial motor vehicle drivers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-17 | Published 5-26-2010 | |
2010-05-13 | Report approved by the Governor on 5-12-2010. 2009 Wisconsin Act 326 | |
2010-05-11 | Presented to the Governor on 5-11-2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Report correctly enrolled | |
2010-04-20 | Received from Senate concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-04-20 | Read a third time and concurred in | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended | |
2010-04-20 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-04-20 | Read a second time | |
2010-04-20 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up | |
2010-04-20 | Available for scheduling | |
2010-04-20 | Report concurrence recommended by committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources, Ayes 7, Noes 0 | |
2010-04-20 | Executive action taken | |
2010-01-22 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation, Tourism, Forestry, and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-19 | Received from Assembly | |
2010-01-19 | Ordered immediately messaged | |
2010-01-19 | Read a third time and passed | |
2010-01-19 | Rules suspended | |
2010-01-19 | Ordered to a third reading | |
2010-01-19 | Read a second time | |
2010-01-13 | Placed on calendar 1-19-2010 by committee on Rules | |
2009-05-19 | Referred to committee on Rules | |
2009-05-19 | Report passage recommended by committee on Transportation, Ayes 12, Noes 0 | |
2009-05-07 | Executive action taken | |
2009-04-09 | Public hearing held | |
2009-03-09 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-26 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time and referred to committee on Transportation | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced |